Nelli, Jennifer Maria (CPSO#: 95778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055212100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Nelli Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Van Der Pol ( CPSO# 95958 )
Dr. J. Nelli ( CPSO# 95778 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2V8


Corporation Name: Christian van der Pol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Van Der Pol ( CPSO# 95958 )
Dr. J. Nelli ( CPSO# 95778 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Diagnostic Centre
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 103
Mississauga ON  L5M 1P3

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7

Business Address:
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 2V8

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MARIA NELLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NELLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2017