Nelson, Alexandra Blanche (CPSO#: 91926)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: Nuttall, Alexandra Blanche (used until: 17 Jan 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
797 Princess St
Suite 409
Kingston ON  K7L1G1
Phone: 6135413922
Fax: 6135410744
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.J. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cooper ( CPSO# 82797 )
Dr. A. Nelson ( CPSO# 91926 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Corporation Name: Dr. A. B. Nelson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nelson ( CPSO# 91926 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 522-2100

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Quarry Medical Clinic
797 Princess Street
Suite 409
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 541-3922

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA BLANCHE NELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NELSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 23 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2014