Nelson, Delene Joy (CPSO#: 76254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fort William Family Health Network
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1257
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DELENE JOY NELSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NELSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003