Nemeth, Joe (CPSO#: 75835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:Medical University of Debrecen, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McGill University Health Center
Dept of Emergency Medicine, MGH, 16
1650 Cedar ave
Montreal QC  H3G 1A4
Phone: 5142996190

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOE NEMETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEMETH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2016