Nepomuceno, Roman Gabriel (CPSO#: 111659)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Division of Critical Care Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROMAN GABRIEL NEPOMUCENO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEPOMUCENO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2017 to 23 Aug 2017
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 May 2018 to 30 May 2018
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018