Nery, Pablo Balbuena (CPSO#: 84207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Jul 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:Pontificia-Catolica Do Rio Grande Do Sul, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Room H1285
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7272
Fax: (613) 696-7123
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pablo B. Nery Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nery ( CPSO# 84207 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4914

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 14 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2006 to 18 Jul 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 19 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Pablo Balbuena Nery may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Cardiology,  University  of Ottawa, in which Dr. Nery
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank  of  Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  when  Dr.  Nery no
                  longer holds the appoinment, referred to in clause 1.