Nesbitt, Gillian Catherine (CPSO#: 81596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 1609
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7547
Fax: (647) 826-1527
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MS Cardiology Service
491 Lawrence Avenue West Suite 500
North York ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: 4167819500
Fax: 4167817985
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gillian Nesbitt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Nesbitt ( CPSO# 81596 )

Business Address:
Sinai Cardiology Associates
500 - 491 Lawrence Avenue West
North York ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 586-3330

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 586-8495

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 586-8495

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 586-8495

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 1609
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-8495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN CATHERINE NESBITT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NESBITT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009