Neskovic, Svetlana (CPSO#: 85119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Active Care Medical Clinic Kanata
1108 Klondike Road
Ottawa ON  K2K 0G1
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: (000) 000-0000
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Appletree Medical Group
Unit C153
240 Sparks Street
Ottawa ON  K1P 6Z9
Canada
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 702-0248
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Appletree Medical Group
368 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 5C1
Canada
Phone: (613) 482-0118
Fax: (613) 702-0248
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Svetlana Neskovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Neskovic ( CPSO# 85119 )

Business Address:
Active Care Medical Clinic Kanata
1108 Klondike Road
Ottawa ON  K2K 0G1
Phone Number: (613) 254-9777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SVETLANA NESKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NESKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008