Neto, Gina Maria Picado (CPSO#: 70759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
CHEO
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3955
Fax: (613) 738-4852
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Neto Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Neto ( CPSO# 70759 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GINA MARIA PICADO NETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NETO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 12 Aug 1996 to 24 Aug 1996
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1996
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Aug 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1999