Neufeld, Troy Mitchell (CPSO#: 92956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth and Smiths Falls Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H2K1
Phone: (613) 267-1500
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L2V7
Canada
Phone: (613) 548-3232
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Troy Neufeld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 31 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Troy Neufeld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Neufeld ( CPSO# 92956 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care
North Hastings Hospital
1 Manor Lane
PO Box 157
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Business Address:
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Phone Number: (613) 283-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TROY MITCHELL NEUFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUFELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012