Nevo, Ori (CPSO#: 80168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 06 Dec 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The Hebrew University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4 170
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4920
Fax: (416) 480-4933
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O. Nevo and G.W. Adler Nevo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Nevo ( CPSO# 80168 )
Dr. G. Adler Nevo ( CPSO# 82322 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M4-170
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4920

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room A613
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2003 to 23 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Nov 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 05 Dec 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Ori Nevo may practise medicine independently in obstetrics and gynaecology,
            only.