Newell, Emilie Novak (CPSO#: 21709)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Jan 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
111 Waterloo Street
London ON  N6B 2M4
Phone: (519) 433-6605
Fax: (519) 433-8555
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emilie Newell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Newell ( CPSO# 21709 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
111 Waterloo Street
London ON  N6B 2M4
Phone Number: (519) 433-6605

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 04 Apr 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1968
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 08 Oct 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 20 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 20 Jan 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 10 Mar 2005
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Apr 2005
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Apr 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 21 Sep 2012
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 21 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Oct 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  October  25,  2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate  of registration held by Dr. Emilie Novak Newell,
            in accordance with an undertaking  and  consent  given  by  Dr.  Newell  to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr.  Newell  has relinquished her prescribing privileges with respect  to
                  the  following   drugs,  substances  and  preparations  set  out  in  the
                  corresponding regulations,  as  amended from time to time, and summarized
                  as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished       Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                       X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)              X



            As from 11:59 p.m., August 21, 2008, by  order  of  the Discipline Committee of
            the  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of Ontario, the  following  terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the  certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Emilie Novak Newell:

                  (a)     Dr.  Newell  shall practise only in accordance  with  a  schedule
                        approved by the College;
                  
                  (b)    Dr. Newell shall  complete  all  reports  by the end of seven days
                        after seeing the patients in the case of OHIP  reports and fourteen
                        days after seeing the patients and receiving all  relevant  records
                        for reports done as independent medical examinations; 
                  
                  (c)    Dr. Newell shall only practise under the supervision of a practice
                        monitor acceptable to the College who has signed an undertaking  in
                        the  form  attached  as  Appendix "A" (to the original Order).  The
                        practice monitor shall review  Dr.  Newell's  charts  on a schedule
                        approved  by  the College to monitor her completion of reports  and
                        will report to  the  College  on  a  schedule to be approved by the
                        College, and immediately should he/she  find  that  Dr.  Newell has
                        failed to comply with any of the terms or conditions in this Order.
                        All  of  the  monitoring  and  reporting  will  be  at Dr. Newell's
                        expense;
                  
                  (d)     Should  the  College receive a report from Dr. Newell's  practice
                        monitor indicating that Dr. Newell is not in compliance with any of
                        the conditions in  this  Order,  the  Registrar  shall  suspend her
                        certificate  of registration, such suspension to take effect  seven
                        days after Dr. Newell has been provided with notice of the intended
                        suspension unless Dr. Newell has provided the College:
                  
                        i.    compelling medical evidence to justify the failure
                        ii.   compelling  personal  circumstances to justify the failure to
                              comply; or
                        iii.  evidence that she is in fact in compliance with this Order.
                  
                        The suspension is to remain in  effect  until  the practice monitor
                        has  reported  to  the  College that, to his/her satisfaction,  Dr.
                        Newell has become current  in her reports and is in compliance with
                        this  Order  at  which  time  the  Registrar  shall  reinstate  her
                        certificate of registration.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Sep 2012
Summary:

On September 20, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Emilie Novak Newell 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that she has engaged in conduct or an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. Newell 
did not contest the allegations. 
 
Between October 15, 2008 and March 27, 2011, Dr. Newell mistakenly represented herself as a 
Fellow of the Royal College, after her Fellowship was removed on October 15, 2008 and after 
she had been sent correspondence advising her of the termination of her Fellowship. After March 
27, 2011, Dr. Newell stopped representing herself as a Fellow of the Royal College and took 
steps to notify the CPSO and lawyers, insurers, agencies and firms to whom she provided 
specialist services as a physiatrist between October 2008 and March 27, 2011, to advise them that 
she was not recognized as a specialist in that time period.  
 
Dr. Newell breached the August 21, 2008 Order of the Discipline Committee, which required her 
to practice under the supervision of a practice monitor to review her charts. In February of 2010, 
Dr. Newell advised the CPSO that she was going to be on a medical leave and undertook to 
inform the CPSO when she returned.  On April 6, 2010, Dr. Newell returned to work but failed 
to notify the CPSO or her practice monitor.  In response to inquiries from the CPSO in January 
2011, Dr. Newell admitted she had been working since April and had not informed the CPSO or 
her monitor.  The monitor reviewed her charts on February 15, 2011, and found they were 
complete and up to date.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered a public reprimand and a three-month suspension of Dr. 
Newell s certificate of registration.  The terms, conditions and limitations currently on Dr. 
Newell s certificate of registration shall remain in full force and effect.   In addition, Dr. Newell 
was ordered to pay costs to the CPSO in the amount of $3,650. 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 20, 2012


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Aug 2008
Summary:

On August 21, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Newell committed an act of professional misconduct in that she has 
committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional. 
 
 The Discipline Committee ordered the following:  
 
1.    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions 
      and limitations on Dr. Newell s Certificate of Registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Newell shall practise only in accordance with a schedule approved by the 
            College;  
 
      (b)     Dr. Newell shall complete all reports by the end of seven days after seeing the 
            patients in the case of OHIP reports and fourteen days after seeing the patients and 
            receiving all relevant records for reports done as independent medical 
            examinations;  
 
      (c)     Dr. Newell shall only practise under the supervision of a practice monitor 
            acceptable to the College who has signed an undertaking in the form attached as 
            Appendix A  (to the original Order).  The practice monitor shall review Dr. 
            Newell s charts on a schedule approved by the College to monitor her completion 
            of reports and will report to the College on a schedule to be approved by the 
            College, and immediately should he/she find that Dr. Newell has failed to comply 
            with any of the terms or conditions in this Order.  All of the monitoring and 
            reporting will be at Dr. Newell s expense;  
 
      (d)    Should the College receive a report from Dr. Newell s practice monitor indicating 
            that Dr. Newell is not in compliance with any of the conditions in this Order, the 
            Registrar shall suspend her certificate of registration, such suspension to take 
            effect seven days after Dr. Newell has been provided with notice of the intended 
            suspension unless Dr. Newell has provided the College                            
                                                
            i.      compelling medical evidence to justify the failure to comply;  
                  ii.     compelling personal circumstances to justify the failure to comply; or  
                       iii.      evidence that she is in fact in compliance with this Order. 
 
The suspension is to remain in effect until the practice monitor has reported to the College that, to 
his/her satisfaction, Dr. Newell has become current in her reports and is in compliance with this 
Order at which time the Registrar shall reinstate her certificate of registration. 
 
2.    The Discipline Committee Orders Dr. Newell to pay to the College costs in the amount of 
      $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order.  
 
 3.         The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the 
register. 
               
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 21, 2008