Newman, Dana Ethel (CPSO#: 92155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Spanish

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Family Medicine Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA ETHEL NEWMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEWMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2009 to 27 Dec 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Dec 2009 to 04 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Oct 2010 to 04 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 29 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2011