Ng, Carly Joyce (CPSO#: 95288)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856
Fax: 416-340-4300
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-5058
Fax: (416) 586-4719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carly Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ng ( CPSO# 95288 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 206
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5058

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLY JOYCE NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013