Ng, Christa Colleen (CPSO#: 81952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 2004

Summary

Former Names: Brambilla, Christa Colleen (used until: 12 Feb 2013 )     Ng, Christa Colleen (used until: 27 Jun 2006 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornerstone Family Medical Centre
Suite 106
100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Phone: (613) 498-0444
Fax: (613) 498-4850
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: (613) 345-5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christa Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ng ( CPSO# 81952 )

Business Address:
5 Home Street
Brockville ON  K6V 0A5
Phone Number: (613) 423-1111

Business Address:
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
Cornerstone Family Medical Centre
Suite 106
100 Strowger Boulevard
Brockville ON  K6V 5J9
Phone Number: (613) 498-0444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTA COLLEEN NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2004