Ng, Cindy Kar Wai (CPSO#: 82959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northtown Medical Clinic
Unit 108
10 Northtown Way
Toronto ON  M2N 7L4
Phone: (416) 270-8781
Fax: (416) 912-8270
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY KAR WAI NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2007