Ng, Jeffrey Andrew (CPSO#: 108593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
Department of Anaesthesia
40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ANDREW NG shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NG is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. NG shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NG is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. NG shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NG is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NG no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Apr 2016 to 29 Apr 2016
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018