Ng, Karen Wing-Kam (CPSO#: 88621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Unit 4-5
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ng ( CPSO# 88621 )

Business Address:
102-171 East Liberty Street
Toronto ON  M6K 3P6
Phone Number: (416) 599-8348

Business Address:
CAMH
1001 Queen Street West
Units 4 - 5
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN WING-KAM NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013