Ng, Marcus Cho-Yin (CPSO#: 92636)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 06 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2010 to 09 May 2010
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 2011 to 06 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2011