Ng, Terry L (CPSO#: 95715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Division of Medical Oncology
501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Address: Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 09 Aug 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRY L NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2018