Ng, Thomas (CPSO#: 72840)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 7 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2001