Ng, Vivian Tin-Yee (CPSO#: 95439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Division of General Internal Med
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (647) 361-0822
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivian Ng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ng ( CPSO# 95439 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIVIAN TIN-YEE NG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015