Ngae, Min Yi (CPSO#: 94283)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malay, Mandarin

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Centre
Suite 1 179
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 6754779
Fax: (705) 675-4780
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bonin and Queen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. M. Rutherford ( CPSO# 67926 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. D. Bonin ( CPSO# 58373 )
Dr. B. Danielson ( CPSO# 93246 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Corporation Name: Dr. Min Yi Ngae Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Pathology and Lab Med
Suite 1 179
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIN YI NGAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGAE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010