Nghiem, Dung Phuong (CPSO#: 63114)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 20, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dung Phuong Nghiem to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 20, 2017:

Dr. Nghiem practices general medicine in Quebec where she is undergoing a tutorship with the Collège des médecins du Québec (“CMQ”). A College investigation was conducted into Dr. Nghiem’s general medicine practice.

Dr. Nghiem has agreed to provide the College with all documents regarding her tutorship with CMQ, including all reports from her clinical supervisor(s) and any decisions rendered by CMQ.

Following the conclusion of the tutorship and CMQ’s decision with respect to the tutorship, the College will determine whether any further action is warranted.

If Dr. Nghiem wishes to practice in Ontario, she will provide the College with a minimum of 90 days’ notice of her intent. The College reserves the right to take further action in connection with her return to practice in Ontario, including continuing the investigation that was terminated as a result of her undertaking.