Nguyen, Bao Anh Vu (CPSO#: 113640)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2017 to 11 Oct 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2018