Nguyen, Dao Quynh The (CPSO#: 73419)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2010