Nguyen, Duong Ha (CPSO#: 76237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2489 Bloor Street West, Suite 102
Toronto ON  M6S 1R6
Phone: (416) 742-3736
Fax: (416) 742-2818
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Duong Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nguyen ( CPSO# 76237 )

Business Address:
2489 Bloor Street West
Suite 102
Toronto ON  M6S 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 742-3736

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUONG HA NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009