Nguyen, Hong Chau (CPSO#: 88893)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895
Fax: (844) 825-8572
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9080 Yonge Street, Level 2, unit 12
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 6Z9
Canada
Phone: (289) 597-7676
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

95 Bayly Street West
Suite B03
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-2028
Fax: (905) 426-2033
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1290 Keith Ross Crt
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 723-8551
Fax: (905) 723-6319
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adams Gilmour Smith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. K. Smith ( CPSO# 66319 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 25659 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895


Corporation Name: Dr. Hong Chau Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HONG CHAU NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 21 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 22 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2011