Nguyen, Jennifer (CPSO#: 82868)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre For Addiction and
Mental Health
80 Workman Way
4th floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 39364
Fax: (416) 583-1205
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sten Myrehaug Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Myrehaug ( CPSO# 82867 )
Dr. J. Nguyen ( CPSO# 82868 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4834

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010