Nguyen, John Tien-Hao (CPSO#: 90743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
1160 Beaverwood Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1L6
Phone: (613) 692-0244
Fax: (613) 692-0258
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K0T2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nguyen ( CPSO# 90743 )

Business Address:
1160 Beaverwood Road
Suite 2
Manotick ON  K4M 1L6
Phone Number: (613) 692-0244

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 945-1111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN TIEN-HAO NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011