Nguyen, Kinh-Tung Thi (CPSO#: 75064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 318
89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone: (416) 747-0752
Fax: (416) 747-8973
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kinh-Tung Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nguyen ( CPSO# 75064 )

Business Address:
318 - 89 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 4B8
Phone Number: (416) 747-0752

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KINH-TUNG THI NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2004