Nguyen, Laura Nancy Thuy Uyen (CPSO#: 95425)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
7th Floor McMaster Wing
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44154
Fax: (905) 577-1431
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA NANCY THUY UYEN NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018