Nguyen, Nam Anh (CPSO#: 71271)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Jan 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saigon, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pediatrics and Family Clinic
1218 King Street West
Toronto ON  M6K 1G4
Phone: (416) 538-8833
Fax: (416) 538-7685
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nam Anh Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nguyen ( CPSO# 71271 )

Business Address:
Pediatrics and Family Clinic
1218 King Street West
Toronto ON  M6K 1G4
Phone Number: (416) 538-8833

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 27 Jan 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 27 Jan 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 27, 2018, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Nam Anh Nguyen, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Nguyen has given to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                          DR. NAM ANH NGUYEN
                                            ("Dr. Nguyen")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Nguyen, certificate of registration number 71271, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.




            (4)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the
                        assessor dated April 10, 2017 and June 24, 2017, and concerns that
                        may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (4)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (4)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto Faculty of Medicine program in Safe
                              Opioid Prescribing (all three webinars and in-person
                              workshop): www.cepd.utoronto.ca/opioidprescribing;
                  
                        (ii)  Review and discuss with my Clinical Supervisor(s) the
                              following resources:
                          1.    CPSO Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
               
                          2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                Non-Cancer Pain:
                                http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html;
               
                          3.    CMPA advice regarding preventing the misuse of opioids
                                https://www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2015/preventing-the-misuse-of-opioids;
               
                          4.    the Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic
                                Non-Cancer Pain Tool https://thewellhealth.ca/cncp; 
                          5.    Diabetes Canada 2016 Interim Update - Pharmacologic
                                Management of Type 2 Diabetes
                                http://guidelines.diabetes.ca/browse/chapter13_nov-2016;
                                and
               
                    (iii) any additional professional education recommended by my
                          Clinical Supervisor(s).
               
               (b)  I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                    successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof
                    of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports,
                    within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the
                    College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                    successfully completed the Professional Education.
               
               (c)  I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                    to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                    Professional Education.
               
         (6)   Reassessment of Practice

               (a)  I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                    the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (4)
                    above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                    reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                    assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                    acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct
                    observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers,
                    feedback from patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the
                    College.
               
               (b)  I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                    conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
               
               (c)  I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                    receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                    with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                    Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                    Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                    the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
               
         (7)   Monitoring 

               (a)  I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                    location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                    limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                    jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                    (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                    undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                    Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                    location.
               
               
               (b)  I, Dr. Nguyen, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                    with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient
                    records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                    my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
               
               (c)  I, Dr. Nguyen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                    appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                    institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                    College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                    Undertaking. 
               
               (d)  I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                    consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                    respectively. 
               
         C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

         (8)   I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
               in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

         (9)   I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
               responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
               arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
               Undertaking. 

         (10)  I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
               of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
               reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
               so.

         (11)  I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
               to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
               any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

         (12)  I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
               Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
               incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
               the Discipline Committee of the College.

         (13)  I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
               conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
               purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

         (14)  Public Register

               (a)  I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                    Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                    the Public Register.
               
               (b)  I, Dr. Nguyen, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                    being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following
                    summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
                    period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
               
                    
                    The College received information regarding Dr. Nguyen's standard of
                    practice. As a result of the information:
               
                          Dr. Nguyen will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                          Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months. 
                          Dr. Nguyen will engage in professional education in opioid
                          prescribing and diabetic management.
                          Dr. Nguyen's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                          selected by the College approximately 6 months following the
                          end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
               
         D.    CONSENT

         (15)  I, Dr. Nguyen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
               following information to any person who requires this information for the
               purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
               to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

               (a)  any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                    entering into this Undertaking;
               
               (b)  any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                    of, my practice; and 
               
               (c)  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                    this Undertaking.
               
         (16)  I, Dr. Nguyen, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
               Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
               circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
               arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

         (17)  I, Dr. Nguyen, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
               my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
               Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
               and to one another, any information:

               (a)  relevant to this Undertaking;
               
               (b)  relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                    set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
               
               (c)  relevant to the Reassessment;
               
               (d)  relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                    Undertaking; and/or  
               
               (e)  which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                    Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                    a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 27, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nam Anh Nguyen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 27, 2018:

The College received information regarding Dr. Nguyen’s standard of practice. As a result of the information:

Dr. Nguyen will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Nguyen will engage in professional education in opioid prescribing and diabetic management.

Dr. Nguyen’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College approximately 6 months following the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.