Nguyen, Olivier Francois (CPSO#: 95975)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Nguyen, Olivier (used until: 23 Aug 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MICHAEL GARRON HOSPITAL (TEGH)
825 Coxwell Ave, Toronto, ON M4C3E7
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: (416) 469-6253
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Nguyen ( CPSO# 95975 )

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLIVIER FRANCOIS NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015