Nguyen, Quy Duong (CPSO#: 83591)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400 Spence Ave
Hawkesbury, Ontario
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 2Y3
Phone: (613) 632-0997
Electoral District: 07

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Record Storage 111 St. Regis Crescent Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 416 398 0636 fax 4163985932
Instructions: Contact RSRS
Date Received: 18 Nov 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 May 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QUY DUONG NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2010