Nguyen, Scott Dinh (CPSO#: 100561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Creditview Medical
14B-1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5V 1N3
Phone: (905) 567-4622
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. D. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nguyen ( CPSO# 52463 )
Dr. S. Nguyen ( CPSO# 100561)

Business Address:
Creditview Medical
Room 14B
1240 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5V 1N3
Phone Number: (905) 902-7268

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT DINH NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2015