Nguyen, Thi Ngoc Dang (CPSO#: 75303)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Dec 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
289 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2N3
Phone: (519) 742-0001
Fax: (519) 742-2119
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thi Ngoc Dang Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen ( CPSO# 75303 )

Business Address:
289 Frederick Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 2N3
Phone Number: (519) 742-0001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THI NGOC DANG NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2002