Nguyen, Tung Thanh Cao (CPSO#: 75296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Booth Neurology
343 Booth Street
Unit B
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1
Phone: (613) 233-3030
Fax: (613) 233-1061
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Hospital
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-7000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tung TC Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen ( CPSO# 75296 )

Business Address:
343 Booth Street
Suite B
Ottawa ON  K1R 7K1
Phone Number: (613) 233-3030

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TUNG THANH CAO NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002