Nichols, Erwin Bernard (CPSO#: 16736)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Nov 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 200 - 4473 Innes Rd Orleans ON K4A 3J7
Date Received: 12 Sep 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2018

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: May 30, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On May 30, 2018, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required general family medicine physician, Dr. Erwin Nichols, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Nichols to:

• Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the following course:
o University of Toronto Medical Records course

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 9 months;

• Review the following policies, guidelines or tools with reference to how each is applicable to family medicine:
o 2017 Canadian Guideline for Safe and Effective Use of Opioids for Chronic Non-Cancer Pain.
o CPSO Prescribing Drugs Policy
o CPSO Medical Records Policy
o Review of the Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic Non-Cancer Pain Tool
o Prescribing and Tapering Benzodiazepines
o Screening for Cervical, Breast and Colon cancer as obtained in Cancer Care Ontario’s Screen for Life
o CMAJ recommendations on screening for prostate cancer with the PSA test
o Choosing Wisely – Family Medicine

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately 3 months following the completion of the Education Plan.