Nicholson, Katharine Jill (CPSO#: 90983)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400 Mckeown Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 0B2
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Katharine J. Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nicholson ( CPSO# 90983 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
400 Mckeown Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 495-8115

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHARINE JILL NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 2014 to 13 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014