Nickerson, Duncan Alexander (CPSO#: 75414)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: French

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2005