Nicoara, Lucia Viorica (CPSO#: 83188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-6870 Goreway Dr.
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone: 905-677-4200
Fax: 905-677-0541
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lucia Viorica Nicoara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Nicoara ( CPSO# 83188 )

Business Address:
201 - 6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone Number: (905) 677-4200

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCIA VIORICA NICOARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICOARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2007