Niebergall, Michael Cory (CPSO#: 93228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Phone: (705) 472-2646
Fax: (705) 476-6543
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Niebergall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Niebergall ( CPSO# 93228 )

Business Address:
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
206-107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 7K8
Phone Number: (705) 472-2646

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CORY NIEBERGALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIEBERGALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015