Niel, Ullanda Nicole (CPSO#: 90493)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
629 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A4
Phone: (416) 847-4101
Fax: (416) 284-1964
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9 Butternut Lane
Markham ON  L3P 3M1
Canada
Phone: 905-294-0944
Fax: 905-294-4378
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Isaac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Isaac ( CPSO# 88362 )
Dr. U. Niel ( CPSO# 90493 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-8800

Business Address:
Suite 103
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 223-4884

Business Address:
Suite 206
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (647) 427-0195

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6186

Business Address:
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 756-6186

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ULLANDA NICOLE NIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011