Nii, Masaki (CPSO#: 79221)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Okayama Medical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 May 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 2005