Nijmeh, Larry John (CPSO#: 76459)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone: (905) 623-3331
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1615 Dundas St E
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Canada
Phone: (905) 240-6500
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarborough and Rouge Hospital
General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. J. Nijmeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cataudella ( CPSO# 76146 )
Dr. L. Nijmeh ( CPSO# 76459 )

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Toronto ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
1615 Dundas Street East
Suite 17X
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARRY JOHN NIJMEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIJMEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003