Nikolaou, Vasileios Sotirios (CPSO#: 91837)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Aristotelian University of Thessaloniki, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 18 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011