Nikonova, Anna S (CPSO#: 95438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: Nikonova, Anna (used until: 29 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Hamilton ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (905) 387-949
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Oncology
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nikonova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nikonova ( CPSO# 95438 )

Business Address:
Department of Oncology
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
2 - 084 Donnely Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA S NIKONOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKONOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2014 to 12 Dec 2014
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2015