Nikpour, Mandana (CPSO#: 80266)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2003 to 28 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 29 Nov 2003 to 14 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008