Nimir, Asim Babo (CPSO#: 83249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg District Memmorial Hosp
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611 Ext. 5232
Fax: (519) 842-7008
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medpoint Health Care Cente
Suite 233
Citi Plaza, Wellington St
London ON  N6A 3N7
Canada
Phone: (519) 432-1919
Fax: (519) 432-9529
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asim Nimir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nimir ( CPSO# 83249 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Business Address:
Medpoint Health Care Centre
Citi Plaza
233 - 355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-1919

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jan 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASIM BABO NIMIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2011